open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:15-cv-04924
    Party Name:Mary E. Nottage v. Six Unknown Los Angeles Police Officers and Unknown Employees of West Hills Hospital
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:September 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:July 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting (CV 104A)]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Chief Magistrate Judge Transferring Case (non-consent)]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Granting (CV 104A)]
    Date Published:April 06, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?622457
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =