open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:5:16-cv-00688
    Party Name:Robert Elguezabal v. City of Santa Fe Springs et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:June 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:June 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form]
    Date Published:April 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?645163
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =