open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-02966
    Party Name:Kirsty Powell v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:September 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Minutes]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Chief District Judge Transferring Case]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64 or pleading)]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?646729
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =