open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-03117
    Party Name:Jontierra Marie Shakur Fletcher et al v. City of Compton, et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:August 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transferring Case purs GO 14-03 (Related Case)(CV 34)]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?647280
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =