open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-03223
    Party Name:Alvin C Lyles, Jr. v. City of Huntington Park et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:September 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amendment (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?647547
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =