open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04341
    Party Name:Miguel Angel Llamas v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:May 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:September 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Link Motions to Minutes]
    Date Published:August 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:August 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:August 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:August 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Non-Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:July 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for ADR Procedure No. 2 - (ADR-1)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:October 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:October 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:October 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?650747
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =