open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-05614
    Party Name:Khanly Saycon, Jr. et al v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:March 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:February 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:November 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:November 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Final]
    Date Published:November 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief (non-motion non-appeal)]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Interim]
    Date Published:October 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Bifurcate]
    Date Published:October 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support]
    Date Published:October 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Preclude]
    Date Published:October 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Exclude]
    Date Published:October 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:October 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:September 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit to Motion]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:September 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:September 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:September 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Related Document]
    Date Published:September 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document Under Seal]
    Date Published:August 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Review]
    Date Published:August 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Transcript]
    Date Published:August 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:July 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney (G-01)]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Minutes]
    Date Published:June 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:May 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:November 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for ADR Procedure No. 3 - (ADR-1)]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:October 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:July 29, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?654367
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =