open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-05899
    Party Name:Jose Leal v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:January 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:January 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave]
    Date Published:May 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Proceed (CV-11D) before US Magistrate Judge Voluntary Program]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:January 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:November 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:August 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?655341
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =