open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-05924
    Party Name:Tito Ace Thomas v. Hawthorne Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:December 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:December 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:October 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition]
    Date Published:October 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?655450
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =