open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:8:16-cv-01601
    Party Name:Banc of California, Inc. et al v. Farmers and Merchants Bank of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:June 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:October 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:October 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Order]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit (non-trial)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:June 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:June 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:June 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:June 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:June 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Motion (Generic sealed motion type event)]
    Date Published:May 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Related Document]
    Date Published:May 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment (Partial)]
    Date Published:May 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document Under Seal]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Link Motions to Minutes]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:January 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Document (Non-Motion)]
    Date Published:January 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:October 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:August 31, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?657039
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =