open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-06828
    Party Name:United States of America v. Three Real Properties Located on Lennox Avenue, Van Nuys, California
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Default by Judge]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:January 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk to Enter Default]
    Date Published:January 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:December 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:December 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Warrant for Seizure Issued]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Custodian]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum by U S Attorney re Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?658025
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =