open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-06962
    Party Name:Estate of Lionel Gibson, Jr. et al v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Proceed (CV-11D) before US Magistrate Judge Voluntary Program]
    Date Published:December 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:December 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)]
    Date Published:November 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:August 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:August 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?658427
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =