open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-06963
    Party Name:Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC et al v. City of Long Beach, a California Municipality et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Order]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Related Document]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Ruling]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Non-Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joinder]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay Case]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Transcript]
    Date Published:November 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:October 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:August 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form]
    Date Published:June 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:November 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:October 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:October 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:October 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Chief District Judge Transferring Case]
    Date Published:October 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:August 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for ADR Procedure No. 3 - (ADR-1)]
    Date Published:August 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:August 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Party]
    Date Published:August 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:July 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Document (Non-Motion)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joinder (Motion Related)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 16-05 (CV-52)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:February 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney (G-01)]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transferring Case purs GO 14-03 (Related Case)(CV 34)]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 14-03 (CV-52)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?658428
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =