open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-06785
    Party Name:Estate of Feras Morad et al v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued]
    Date Published:September 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Related Document]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Trial]
    Date Published:August 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk to Tax Costs (CV-59)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Transcript]
    Date Published:July 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt for Release of Exhibits to Counsel upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial (G-38)]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Unredacted Document]
    Date Published:July 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Completed]
    Date Published:July 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:July 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:July 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Held and Continued]
    Date Published:June 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Begun]
    Date Published:June 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference Order - Final]
    Date Published:June 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:June 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief (non-motion non-appeal)]
    Date Published:June 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Interim]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:May 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Exclude]
    Date Published:May 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Requesting]
    Date Published:May 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Limit]
    Date Published:May 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Bifurcate]
    Date Published:May 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:November 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:November 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:November 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Review]
    Date Published:September 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement re Discovery Matter]
    Date Published:August 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document Under Seal]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel Deposition]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:July 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:June 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Expedite]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay Case]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Chief District Judge Transferring Case]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:October 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?657858
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =