open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-07605
    Party Name:Andy Obinna v. The Hawthorne Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:November 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:November 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:November 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:October 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?660569
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =