open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-08924
    Party Name:Armando Sandoval v. City of San Fernando et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:December 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:December 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:December 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:December 01, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?664402
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =