open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-09157
    Party Name:Ashleigh Sola, et al v. City of Long Beach, et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:February 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:February 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:February 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:February 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:February 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:July 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joinder]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Proceed (CV-11D) before US Magistrate Judge Voluntary Program]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:December 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?664999
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =