open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:8:16-ap-01261-MW
    Party Name:Farmers & Merchants Bank Of Long Beach v. Newman
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Casey, (TR) Thomas H [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Casey, (TR) Thomas H [Hearing Held (Other)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Casey, (TR) Thomas H [Notice]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Casey, (TR) Thomas H [Mediator's cert conclusion (settled)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Casey, (TR) Thomas H [Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Casey, (TR) Thomas H [Declaration]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Casey, (TR) Thomas H [Assigning matter to mediation program - DISCHARGEABILITY (BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:July 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Casey, (TR) Thomas H [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Casey, (TR) Thomas H [X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Casey, (TR) Thomas H [Hearing Continued (Other)]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Casey, (TR) Thomas H [Status report]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Casey, (TR) Thomas H [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Casey, (TR) Thomas H [Summons Service Executed]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Casey, (TR) Thomas H [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 14, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1772076
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =