open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-09345
    Party Name:United States of America v. One Real Property Located On Mary Ellen Avenue, Van Nuys, California
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:June 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:June 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:May 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk to Enter Default]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:December 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Warrant for Seizure Issued]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Custodian]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum by U S Attorney re Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?665940
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =