open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-09641
    Party Name:E.H. et al v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:July 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk to Tax Costs (CV-59)]
    Date Published:July 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Minutes]
    Date Published:June 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:May 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:May 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:May 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:April 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:April 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:August 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:August 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to Appear]
    Date Published:June 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear]
    Date Published:June 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:February 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:January 03, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?666826
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =