open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:17-cv-00109
    Party Name:Daniel Lopez v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mediation Report (ADR-3) Not Held - Settled]
    Date Published:September 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:August 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:June 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?667168
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =