open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:17-cv-00549
    Party Name:Vincent Troy Pina v. The City of Long Beach, CA
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacating Reference to Magistrate Judge (CV-114)]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Trial Date]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Objection to R&R]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:October 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:September 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reschedule]
    Date Published:August 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:March 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Order]
    Date Published:January 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:December 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 O]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:November 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:October 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Chief Magistrate Judge Transferring Case (non-consent)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89)]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?668468
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =