open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:17-cv-01467
    Party Name:MKay, Inc. et al v. City of Huntington Park, et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Satisfaction of Judgment]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Relief]
    Date Published:August 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:March 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:March 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:March 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit to Motion]
    Date Published:March 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment (Partial)]
    Date Published:March 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney (G-01)]
    Date Published:January 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure]
    Date Published:November 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Order]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Aside Default]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:August 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacate ADR Referral Notice]
    Date Published:August 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:August 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Related Document]
    Date Published:August 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:July 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:June 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:June 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit (non-trial)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Minutes]
    Date Published:May 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:March 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form]
    Date Published:March 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:March 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:March 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk to Enter Default]
    Date Published:March 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?671014
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =