open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:17-cv-02089
    Party Name:Martin Vogel v. Extra Space of Sunland Foothill Boulevard, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:June 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:June 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:May 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:March 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?672774
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =