open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:3:17-cv-00548
    Party Name:Broom v. Farmers and Merchants Bank of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
    Date Published:October 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Party]
    Date Published:September 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:August 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:August 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:June 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:June 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Conference]
    Date Published:May 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Early Neutral Evaluation Conference]
    Date Published:May 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:May 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Early Neutral Evaluation]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Party With Financial Interest]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.casd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?527920
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =