open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:17-cv-03895
    Party Name:United States of America v. Real Property Located in Diamond Bar, California
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Consent]
    Date Published:September 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:July 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)]
    Date Published:May 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:May 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum by U S Attorney re Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Enforce Judgment]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?182028
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =