open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:17-cv-03567
    Party Name:Jeffrey Goodin v. City of Glendora et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Related Document]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Interim]
    Date Published:July 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:July 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:June 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:April 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document Under Seal]
    Date Published:April 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:February 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Show Cause Hearing - optional html form]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:February 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:February 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery]
    Date Published:December 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:December 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:November 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:November 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:June 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:June 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reassign Case upon Recusal of Magistrate Judge (CV-110)]
    Date Published:May 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:May 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?677979
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =