open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:5:17-cv-01006
    Party Name:Latesha Lewis et al v. City of Glendora et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:March 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:October 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacate ADR Referral Notice]
    Date Published:October 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:July 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Refund of Fees Paid (G-124)]
    Date Published:June 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:June 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Refund of Fees (G-124) - Referred to Judge]
    Date Published:June 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 22, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?678856
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =