open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:17-cv-04172
    Party Name:John Doe v. City of Compton
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:May 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document Under Seal]
    Date Published:October 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:October 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:October 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:October 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:October 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:July 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:July 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:June 06, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?680294
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =