open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:17-cv-04295
    Party Name:The Estate of Sinuon Samantha Pream et al v. The City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Document (Non-Motion)]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Show Cause Hearing - optional html form]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Satisfaction of Judgment]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment/Renewal of Judgment]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Trial]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk to Tax Costs (CV-59)]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Unredacted Document]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt for Release of Exhibits to Counsel upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial (G-38)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Completed]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Held and Continued]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Begun]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Transcript]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Preclude]
    Date Published:November 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Exclude]
    Date Published:November 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference Order - Final]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Final - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:July 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Order]
    Date Published:June 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:June 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment (Partial)]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:October 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Chief District Judge Transferring Case]
    Date Published:October 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:October 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:October 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Guardian ad Litem]
    Date Published:September 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:July 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:June 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:June 12, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?680706
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =