open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:8:17-ap-01108-SC
    Party Name:Farmers & Merchants Bank Of Long Beach v. Mugar et al
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Hearing Continued (Other)]
    Date Published:May 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Substitution of attorney]
    Date Published:May 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document]
    Date Published:May 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Withdraw As Attorney (motion)]
    Date Published:May 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Notice]
    Date Published:May 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Hearing Held (Motion)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Request for judicial notice]
    Date Published:May 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Reply]
    Date Published:May 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Opposition]
    Date Published:May 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Hearing Set (Motion)]
    Date Published:April 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Hearing Held (Other)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:December 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:November 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Declaration]
    Date Published:November 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:November 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3))]
    Date Published:November 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [X - Motion (Generic) (motion)]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Notice of Motion For Order Without a Hearing (LBR 9013-1(p) or (q))]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Stipulation (motion)]
    Date Published:October 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:September 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Notice of Lodgment]
    Date Published:September 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Status report]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Summons Service Executed]
    Date Published:June 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Marshack, (TR) Richard A [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 26, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1792992
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =