open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:17-cv-05570
    Party Name:Loren Kalin v City of Long Beach
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:July 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:August 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:August 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?684990
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =