open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:17-cv-05607
    Party Name:Estate of Juan Manuel Avila, Jr., et al v. City of Long Beach, et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference Order - Final]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
    Date Published:December 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mediation Report (ADR-3) Unable to Reach Agreement]
    Date Published:November 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Bifurcate]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Exclude]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:October 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appendix]
    Date Published:October 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment (Partial)]
    Date Published:October 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:February 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:January 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:January 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Chief District Judge Transferring Case]
    Date Published:October 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Non-Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:September 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:September 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:August 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:August 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:August 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?685079
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =