open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-05607
    Party Name:Arogant Hollywood v. City of South Pasadena et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Aside Judgment]
    Date Published:November 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Review]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave]
    Date Published:January 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting (CV 104A)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Staying Case]
    Date Published:November 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appendix]
    Date Published:November 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:November 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:October 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:October 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 O]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Entry]
    Date Published:July 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:June 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to Appeal IFP]
    Date Published:October 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:October 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?686202
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =