open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:5:17-cv-01892
    Party Name:Evan Atencio et al v. City of Azusa
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:December 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:November 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:October 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:September 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)]
    Date Published:September 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 19, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?689083
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =