open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:17-cv-06843
    Party Name:Krystal Lopez v. City of Glendora et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Admissions]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Final - optional html form]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Admission]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Preclude]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Exclude]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Related Document]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mediation Report (ADR-3) Unable to Reach Agreement]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:January 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:January 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:January 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:January 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:December 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:December 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:March 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:March 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 19, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?689131
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =