open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:17-cv-08316
    Party Name:Dieanna Hollie v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:August 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:January 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:January 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:January 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:December 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:December 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV 60P)]
    Date Published:November 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:November 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV-60P)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?694227
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =