open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:17-cv-08663
    Party Name:P. G. v. City of Long Beach, et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Permanent Injunction]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:October 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:May 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:April 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:April 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:April 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:March 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacate]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:March 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:February 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Non-Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:December 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:December 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:December 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:November 30, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?695499
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =