open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00280
    Party Name:Marco Contreras v. City of Compton et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Shorten Time for Hearing]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:July 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mediation Report (ADR-3) Unable to Reach Agreement]
    Date Published:July 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:April 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)]
    Date Published:April 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:March 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:March 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:March 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:March 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for ADR Procedure No. 2 - (ADR-1)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:March 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:February 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:February 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:February 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extending Answer Due Deadline]
    Date Published:February 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:February 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:December 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?696080
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =