open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-00152
    Party Name:Donovan Lamonte Haley v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:July 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:May 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Review]
    Date Published:April 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Ruling]
    Date Published:March 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?698368
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =