open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-01069
    Party Name:Kathleen Williams et al v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement re Discovery Matter]
    Date Published:May 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Non-Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:May 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bifurcate]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel Answers to Interrogatories]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:November 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:October 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:September 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:September 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:September 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:September 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:September 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:September 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:August 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:August 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:August 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:August 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:July 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form]
    Date Published:July 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:July 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extending Answer Due Deadline]
    Date Published:July 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney (G-01)]
    Date Published:June 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appointment of Counsel]
    Date Published:May 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:May 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:April 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:February 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:February 08, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?700719
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =