open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-02521
    Party Name:Raymond Justo Kitilya v. Pomona Police Department
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:October 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:October 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:August 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV 60P)]
    Date Published:May 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV-60P)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge - NON-FINAL]
    Date Published:March 30, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?705679
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =