open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-03036
    Party Name:John Doe v. South Gate City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:June 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:June 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document Under Seal]
    Date Published:May 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extending Answer Due Deadline]
    Date Published:May 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:April 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:April 12, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?706928
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =