open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-03215
    Party Name:Marsha Grigsby v. City of Inglewood, CA et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appendix]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:October 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure]
    Date Published:October 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:July 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form]
    Date Published:July 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:June 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail]
    Date Published:June 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:June 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:June 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Entry]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:May 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89)]
    Date Published:May 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:April 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?707502
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =