open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-03608
    Party Name:Sharaya Brown, et al v. City of Pasadena, et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:October 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:October 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:October 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:July 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:May 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89)]
    Date Published:May 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?708811
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =