open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-03792
    Party Name:Salvador Flores v. City of Pasadena et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Minutes]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Final - optional html form]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Document (Non-Motion)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:October 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:October 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Bifurcate]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Exclude]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Order]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:August 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:August 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:May 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 08, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?709623
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =