open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-03891
    Party Name:City of Beverly Hills v. Federal Transit Administration et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extending Answer Due Deadline]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)]
    Date Published:May 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?709893
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =