open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-04077
    Party Name:Sanjay Patel et al v. City of South El Monte et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:January 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:October 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:August 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Minutes]
    Date Published:August 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:August 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:July 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:June 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:June 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:June 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:June 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?710292
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =