open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-04908
    Party Name:Fouzia Almarou v. City of Gardena, et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:June 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (CV-29)]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney (G-01)]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:November 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Staying Case]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?712693
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =