open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-04843
    Party Name:Amador Hernandez et al v. City of Lynwood et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacating Reference to Magistrate Judge (CV-114)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:December 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:August 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:July 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 06, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?712487
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =